MD HB121 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-21HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback