MD HB121 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a requirement to deposit specified fees collected by the Department of the Environment into a separate account within the Community Right-to-Know Fund; repealing a requirement that specified persons analyze the security of specified facilities in accordance with specified requirements; repealing a specified fee; repealing a requirement that the Department adopt specified hazardous material security standards; repealing a requirement that the Department adopt specified regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Hazardous Material Security - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-15SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-02-24SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2017-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-21HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-20HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback