MD HB121 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding an additional venue in which a person may be prosecuted for a false statement concerning a destructive device or toxic material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612
2016-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2016-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-02-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-02-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-02-15HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2016-02-02HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback