MD HB121 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that a person convicted of specified drug-related offenses is not prohibited from participating in a specified drug treatment program; authorizing a court to depart from a specified mandatory minimum sentence under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; and requiring the savings realized as a result of the Act to revert to the General Fund to be used for funding drug treatment programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum Sentences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-55) (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-55) (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
2015-04-13HousePassed Enrolled
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed (83-55)
2015-04-13HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2015-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (40-7)
2015-04-11SenateSpecial Order until 4/13 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2015-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2015-04-10SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2015-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {268777/1
2015-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2015-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2015-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (85-55)
2015-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-20HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {773320/1 Adopted
2015-03-20HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2015-03-20HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2015-03-19HouseSpecial Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2015-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {572911/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2015-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-26HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0121?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0121f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0121t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0121e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_490_hb0121e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0121_57291101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0121_77332001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0121_26877701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0121.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0121_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0121_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0121,h-0548&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0121,s-1037&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0121,h-1135&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback