MD HB121 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the two-term limit for members of the Board of Trustees of the Chesapeake Bay Trust applies only to consecutive terms; and repealing a limitation on the ability of the Chesapeake Bay Trust to solicit or accept a gift, bequest, or lease of real or personal property.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member Terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-0) (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-0) (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-10 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials