MD HB121 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Office of the Public Defender to submit requests to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and the Comptroller for information regarding the employment status and income of applicants for services of the Office; requiring the request to be accompanied by an authorization for release of information that is in a specified form and signed by the applicant for services; requiring the Department and the Comptroller to comply with specified requests; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services - Requests for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-07 Third Reading Passed (44-0)
2010-04-06 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-06 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-09 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2010-03-17 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-12 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2010-04-07 Returned Passed
2010-03-11 Third Reading Passed (136-0)
2010-03-09 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-09 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-08 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2010-01-26 Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-01-26 Hearing cancelled
2010-01-20 Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-01-18 First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback