MD HB1209 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding maintenance and ongoing service delivery to the requirements that video lottery terminal applicants or licensees shall meet regarding minority business participation; extending a termination date for specified provisions of law relating to minority participation in video lottery facility operations; and providing a termination date for specified duties of the State Lottery Commission and the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs relating to the monitoring, reporting, and taking action on specified activities.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Applicants and Licensees - Minority Business
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (114-19) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Minorities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Minorities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment