MD HB1208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide mental health services appropriately delivered through telehealth to a patient in the patient's home setting; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply, on or before December 1, 2020, to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to certain waivers to implement a pilot program to provide certain telehealth services to recipients under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; etc.
Title
Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {186884/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Diseases
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Diseases
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 141.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |