MD HB1205 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting references to the government of Frederick County in the Annotated Code of Maryland that will be rendered obsolete after the status of the county is changed from a commission county to a charter county; altering the manner in which specified authority may be exercised in the county; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Chartered Counties
Corrective Legislation
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
County Executives
Frederick County
Chartered Counties
Corrective Legislation
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
County Executives
Frederick County