MD HB1202 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain businesses impacted by the construction of a privately operated mass transportation project a credit against the State income tax and State property tax; requiring a person constructing a privately operated mass transportation project to file a certain plan with certain county governments; requiring the Department to certify a business entity as a qualified business if the business entity can establish loss of business income at a property in the area impacted by the construction; etc.
Title
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Privately Operated Mass Transportation Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Construction
Income Tax
Mass Transit
Property Tax
Railroads
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Comptroller
Construction
Income Tax
Mass Transit
Property Tax
Railroads
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of