MD HB12 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility for a certain veteran to reside at a home for veterans that is supervised by the Department of Veterans Affairs to include a veteran who has an honorable discharge from active service with a uniformed service of the United States.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {776586/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-10-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB341 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Subjects
Armed Forces
Federal Government
Health
Housing
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Federal Government
Health
Housing
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |