MD HB1198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "law enforcement unit" as it relates to the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board so as to increase the number of law enforcement units that are subject to review by the Board; altering the composition of the Board; requiring the Board to hold at least four Board meetings in locations rotated throughout different police districts in Baltimore City; and altering specified definitions.
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-1) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {942913/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Abuse
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Counties - Local Laws
Discrimination
Harassment
Language
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Review Boards
State Universities and Colleges
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Counties - Local Laws
Discrimination
Harassment
Language
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Review Boards
State Universities and Colleges