MD HB1198 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the goal of the General Assembly that a specified parent of a child with a disability and specified public agencies mediate specified issues before filing a due process complaint with the Office of Administrative Hearings; requiring specified public agencies to provide a parent of a child with a disability with specified information relating to requesting documents under specified circumstances; altering the duties of the Commission on Special Education Access and Equity; etc.
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {243423/1 Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305367/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Hearings
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Hearings
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset