MD HB1195 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing limited reimbursement of expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016.
Title
Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Education
Ex-Offenders
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Education
Ex-Offenders
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology