MD HB1192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018, on the Department's evaluation of the ability of existing participants in the Live Near Your Work Program to increase their financial grants or incentives under the Program; and requiring the Department to submit this report as a one-time component of a certain annual report.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Live Near Your Work Program - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment