MD HB119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified physicians, under specified circumstances, to practice medicine in the State without a license issued by the State Board of Physicians and without submitting to a criminal history records check while providing medical care to an athletic team's or a sports team's members, band members, cheerleading squad, mascot, coaches, and other staff; requiring that specified physicians can only provide medical care in the State for a maximum of 45 days in a calendar year; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Licensing Exemption - Physicians With Traveling Athletic and Sports Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606382/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Patients
Physicians
Records
Review Boards
Sports and Recreation
Time
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Patients
Physicians
Records
Review Boards
Sports and Recreation
Time