MD HB1189 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $30,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Veditz Center of Maryland, Inc. for the acquisition of the Veditz Center of Maryland, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of Maryland

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
2013-03-08HouseHearing cancelled
2013-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback