MD HB1182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB657
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the collector of property taxes of a county to sell certain property at a tax sale under certain circumstances; and requiring the collector of property taxes to sell certain property on receipt of a certain petition at the county's next regularly scheduled tax sale.
Title
Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87 |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-5) |
2021-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {189435/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-4) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435166/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB657 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |