MD HB1182 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is engaged as an independent contractor directly by a charitable organization and who provides specified services relating to written materials prepared by a charitable organization or an employee of the charitable organization or provides specified services relating to event planning is not included in the definition of fund-raising counsel.
Title
Charitable Organizations and Representatives - Fund-Raising Counsel - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |