MD HB1182 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a hospital from establishing a non-primary percutaneous coronary intervention (PCI) program or providing non-primary PCI services, unless the hospital was operating a PCI program on January 1, 2011, through a certificate of need or a waiver; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop and report recommendations for statutory changes relating to PCI services; etc.
Title
Certificates of Need - Percutaneous Coronary Intervention Services
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. John Donoghue [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Senate Recede | |
2011-04-08 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Withdrawn | |
2011-04-08 | Motion Recede (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-08 | Delegates Pendergrass, Bromwell, and Kach | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |