MD HB1180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to administer the Program; authorizing certain persons to apply to the Administration in fiscal years 2021 through 2023 for a rebate for the cost of acquiring certain electric vehicles; authorizing the Administration to issue a $3,000 rebate for certain new vehicles and a $1,500 rebate for certain used vehicles; providing that, for each fiscal year, the total amount of rebates issued may not exceed $8,000,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Energy Administration - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback