MD HB118 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on State Waters; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force, including one member each from the Senate and House of Delegates of Maryland; requiring the Task Force to analyze specified information and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on State Waters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-32) (Y: 104 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-30) (Y: 102 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-05HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383
2014-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (104-32)
2014-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2014-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {333326/1 Adopted
2014-04-05SenateSpecial Order until 4/7 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2014-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-25SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (102-30)
2014-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {520516/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2014-01-29HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
2014-01-22HouseHearing cancelled
2014-01-29HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
2014-01-09HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0118?ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0118f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0118t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0118e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_383_hb0118e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_52051601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_33332601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0118.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0118_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0118_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0118_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0118,h-0514&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0118,s-1111&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0118,h-1343&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback