MD HB1177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly to codify a certain federal regulation concerning preemption of local regulation of amateur radio station antenna structures; establishing certain requirements that apply to a county or municipal ordinance regulating amateur radio station antenna structures; and applying the Act.
Title
Local Governments - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Radio
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Radio
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology