MD HB1174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering requirements for records that junk dealers and scrap metal processors must keep for each purchase of specified junk or scrap metal in the State; providing for the designation of primary law enforcement units; preempting specified rights and superseding specified laws of counties and municipalities; providing that provisions of law do not apply to specified transactions; requiring specified contracts to be open to inspection by a local law enforcement agency under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Required Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Senators Astle, Garagiola, and Glassman | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-04-02 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-02 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Delegates Vaughn, King, and McHale | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Davis) Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Cemeteries
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Records
Wreckers and Scrap Processors
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Records
Wreckers and Scrap Processors