MD HB1173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to establish qualifications for substitute teachers employed by a county board; requiring a county board to require each substitute teacher to complete an orientation and training program; requiring county boards to train specified school administrators in specified issues related to substitute teachers; requiring a county superintendent to develop a specified in-service training program; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Substitute Teachers - Qualifications, Training, and Study
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fingerprinting
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Reports
Teachers
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fingerprinting
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Reports
Teachers