MD HB1173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law requiring seat belt use do not apply to a law enforcement officer under specified circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seatbelts - Exception for Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1173.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1173f.pdf |