MD HB1167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to implement certain programs to provide certain discounted licenses, stamps, and permits to Maryland residents who meet certain criteria; authorizing the Department to issue certain complimentary licenses and permits to an out-of-state person who certifies that the person meets certain criteria if the person's state of residence extends similar privileges to a person meeting the same criteria; etc.
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting
Sponsors
Del. Dan Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Blind Persons
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Rescue Squads
Residency
Spouses
Sunset
Time
Veterans
Blind Persons
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Rescue Squads
Residency
Spouses
Sunset
Time
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |