MD HB1167 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals; establishing the purpose and method for administering the Program; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to administer the Program; establishing certain standards under which certain employers may be eligible to receive certain grants; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Construction
Ex-Offenders
Grants
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment
Construction
Ex-Offenders
Grants
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment