MD HB1167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming specified model performance evaluation criteria; prohibiting specified performance evaluation criteria from requiring the use of specified student growth data based on State assessments to be used to make personnel decisions before the 2016-2017 school year; etc.
Title
Teachers and Principals - Performance Evaluation Criteria - Use of Student Growth Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {225568/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment