MD HB1165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the duties of a guardian of a disabled person to include the duty to foster and preserve family relationships including assisting to arrange specified visitation and communication.
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216286/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorneys
Cemeteries
Circuit Courts
Communications
Death
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Fees
Funerals
Hearings
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Postal Service
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Vulnerable Adults
Cemeteries
Circuit Courts
Communications
Death
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Fees
Funerals
Hearings
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Postal Service
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Vulnerable Adults