MD HB1161 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Charles County to assess for abatement of zoning violations; adding the assessment to the annual tax bill of the property; specifying how the assessment will be collected; subjecting assessments to specified interest and penalties; and specifying that an assessment is a lien against the property.
Title
Charles County - Assessment for Abatement of Zoning Violation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Charles County
County Commissioners
Interest
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Property Tax
Zoning and Planning
Charles County
County Commissioners
Interest
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Property Tax
Zoning and Planning