MD HB1152 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the holder of a certain Class B beer, wine, and liquor license in Howard County to sell beer, wine, and liquor in sealed containers for off-premises consumption, subject to certain requirements; repealing certain provisions that authorize the Board of License Commissioners for Howard County to issue a certain permit to a certain holder of a certain Class B beer, wine, and liquor license; and authorizing the Board to limit the quantity of alcoholic beverages sold in a single transaction for off-premises consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {654539/1 Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2021-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {913196/1 Adopted
2021-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-08HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages23102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages23902(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1152?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1152f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1152t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1152e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_661_hb1152e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1152_91319601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1152_65453901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1152_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1152_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0461.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1180.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback