MD HB1150 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors is required to issue licenses to applicants for mortician or funeral direction licenses; and requiring an individual who is seeking approval of an apprentice license to complete specified credits at a specified school or in a specified course that is both accredited by a specified entity and approved by the Board.
Title
Health Occupations - Qualifications for Licensure - Mortuary Science, Funeral
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1150.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1150f.pdf |