MD HB115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB205
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1015
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1015
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain requirements for the prepayment of certain real property taxes do not apply to an instrument of writing transferring real property from the estate of a decedent to an heir of the decedent.
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-09-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1015 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1015 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0115?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0115f.pdf |