MD HB115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain retirees of the Teachers' Pension System to elect a change in an optional form of allowance; specifying the manner in which an election to change a certain optional form of allowance shall be made; specifying the manner in which a retiree's allowance shall be calculated and paid under a change to an optional form of allowance made in accordance with the Act; and providing for the termination of the Act on June 30, 2021.
Title
Teachers' Pension System - Option Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |