MD HB115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with interested stakeholders, to assess the benefits and feasibility of developing an electronic system to allow health care providers to access a patient's prescription medication history; requiring the Commission to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020; specifying it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Commission work toward development of an electronic system for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {456181/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assessments
Data
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Data
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset