MD HB115 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Robotics Grant Program to provide grants to public schools and nonprofit robotics clubs in the State to support existing robotics programs and to increase the number of programs in the State; establishing eligibility requirements for the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the State budget an appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Program; requiring the State Department of Education to implement and administer the Program; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Robotics Grant Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-10) (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
2016-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (126-10)
2016-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
2016-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {894837/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (124-14)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {375061/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-02-04HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2016-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0115&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0115f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0115t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0115e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_682_hb0115e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0115_37506101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0115_89483701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0115.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0115_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0115_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0115,h-0479&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0115,s-1014&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0115,h-1162&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback