MD HB1146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the court, on request of the State's Attorney, to make a specified finding as to whether a crime for which a defendant is convicted or receives a probation before judgment disposition is a domestically related crime; requiring the State to bear the burden of proving by a preponderance of the evidence that the crime is a domestically related crime; requiring a finding by the court that a crime is a domestically related crime to become part of the court record for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Domestically Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Conference Committee Report 313023/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Senators Ramirez, Getty, and Zirkin | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 338577/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Report 313023/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Delegates Simmons, Waldstreicher, and Parrott | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-03-30 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 782312/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Elderly Persons
Evidence
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Elderly Persons
Evidence
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Victims