MD HB114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the limit on liability of the State and its units under the Maryland Tort Claims Act for injuries to a claimant arising from an incident or occurrence; authorizing a court to entertain a suit under the Maryland Tort Claims Act under specified circumstances, even if a specified claim was not submitted; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Claim Requirement and Limit on Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-47) (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-46) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-46) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-47) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | Delegates Rosenberg, Parrott, and Dumais |
2015-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-14) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {758373/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-46) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {792917/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |