MD HB1139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to refuse to register or reregister, or suspend the registration of, a motor vehicle for which the person liable for a violation recorded by a vehicle height monitoring system has failed to pay the civil penalty, contest liability, or appear for trial; prohibiting a certain violation from being recorded on the driving record of any person; requiring Baltimore City and the District Court to provide a certain delinquency notice to the State Highway Administration; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880714/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Communications
District Courts
Fines
Highway Administration, State
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Communications
District Courts
Fines
Highway Administration, State
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road