MD HB1139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to notify each local school system and each community school in the State that federal Title I funds may be used for expenses associated with community school coordinators and for the coordination of school and community resources under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to encourage specified school systems and schools in the State to apply for specified federal funding; requiring the Department to provide technical assistance to schools in applying for federal funding; etc.
Title
Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {785060/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Food
Health
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Language
Mental Health
Mentors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Truancy
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Food
Health
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Language
Mental Health
Mentors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Truancy