MD HB1130 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain residential treatment centers be subject to certain reporting requirements regarding inappropriate sexual behavior established by the Maryland Department of Health under certain regulations; and defining "inappropriate sexual behavior".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-17HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback