MD HB113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; establishing that adjudication of a violation under a certain provision of the Act is not a criminal conviction for any purpose and does not impose any of the civil disabilities that may result from a criminal conviction; altering certain penalties; authorizing a certain police officer to issue a certain citation under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Gaming - Civil Offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {258472/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {935961/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0113&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0113f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0113t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0113e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0113_93596101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0113_25847201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0113.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0113_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0113_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0511.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0113_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1046.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1276.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback