MD HB113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual, except under specified circumstances, to be registered by the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists before practicing psychology as a psychology associate in the State; specifying the circumstances under which a registered psychology associate is authorized to practice psychology in the State; requiring an individual to meet specified requirements to qualify for registration as a psychology associate; specifying the examinations that an applicant for a psychology license must pass; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Substitute Committee Amendment {986188/1 Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {966682/1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Education
Electronic Government
Ethics
Examinations
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Mental Health
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Psychologists
Public Information
Records
Registration
Work, Labor and Employment
Discipline
Education
Electronic Government
Ethics
Examinations
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Mental Health
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Psychologists
Public Information
Records
Registration
Work, Labor and Employment