MD HB1128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from making specified formulary changes during a plan year and the open enrollment period that precedes the plan year; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2017.
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Drugs
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Contracts
Drugs
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies