MD HB1121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of a Tier 1 renewable source to include waste-to-energy and refuse-derived fuel; altering the definition of a Tier 2 renewable source to exclude waste-to-energy; and providing that a Tier 1 source using waste-to-energy, refuse-derived fuel, or specified small hydroelectric power plants is eligible for inclusion in meeting a specified standard only if the source is connected with the distribution grid serving Maryland.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio - Waste-to-Energy, Refuse-Derived Fuel, and Small
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {593926/3 Rejected (Y: 34 N: 94 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {593926/2 Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {593926/3 Rejected (Y: 34 N: 94 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {593926/2 Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-04-04 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (78-59) | |
2011-04-04 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (34-94) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (37-96) | |
2011-04-02 | Special Order until next session (Delegate Niemann) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |