MD HB1114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Calvert County, under certain circumstances, to give a certain preference to a bidder whose principal office is in the county over a bidder whose principal office is outside the county; prohibiting any increase in the cost of a contract in which a preference is given from exceeding $25,000; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |