MD HB1113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of Community Health Workers; specifying the purpose and composition of the Board; specifying the terms of a Board member; requiring the Governor to appoint a new member, within a specified time period, if a vacancy on the Board occurs; authorizing the Governor to remove a member of the Board under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to serve as the chair of the Board; requiring the Board to elect specified officers from among its members; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {563629/1 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {124430/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {856080/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Nurses
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Social Workers
Subpoenas
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Nurses
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Social Workers
Subpoenas
Time
Work, Labor and Employment