MD HB1107 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified Baltimore City police officer without a warrant to arrest a person suspected of committing battery against a specified Baltimore City special enforcement officer, special parking enforcement officer, or special traffic enforcement officer under specified circumstances; and requiring a specified police officer to consider whether a person acted in self-defense if mutual battery is suspected.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {828478/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Assault
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Parking
Public Safety
Self Defense
Traffic Regulation
Assault
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Parking
Public Safety
Self Defense
Traffic Regulation