MD HB1106 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Veto override (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Floor - Veto override (88-51) (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-46) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29) (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-43) (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Floor - Veto override (88-51) (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-46) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29) (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-43) (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Veto overridden (32-13) |
2017-01-31 | House | Veto overridden (88-51) |
2017-01-24 | House | Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2017-01-11 | House | Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-46) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-43) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn |
2016-03-17 | House | Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Armed Forces
Auditors and Audits
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Contracts
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Education
Electricians
Energy Matters
Environment
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
Investments
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Plumbing
Prices
Public Service Commission
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Tax Credits
Treasurers
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weights and Measures
Welfare
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Alternative Energy Sources
Armed Forces
Auditors and Audits
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Contracts
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Education
Electricians
Energy Matters
Environment
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
Investments
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Plumbing
Prices
Public Service Commission
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Tax Credits
Treasurers
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weights and Measures
Welfare
Women
Work, Labor and Employment